Financial history MILLENNIUM FARM TRUST

Charity number: 1070145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £123.41k £144.41k £144.41k £226.00k £326.45k
Total expenditure £88.60k £136.72k £136.72k £217.58k £194.59k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A £79.42k £66.40k
Income from government grants £650 £10.00k £78.83k £6.80k £32.42k