Accounts and annual returns SHEFFIELD, HILLSBOROUGH CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1066504
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 09 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required