Financial history THE MARGARET GLADYS GRIMES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1067370
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £23.17k £22.51k £24.04k £21.57k £14.23k
Total expenditure £22.80k £51.93k £14.29k £60.03k £27.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A