LITTLE CHALFONT COMBINED SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance the education of the pupils at Little Chalfont Primary Schhol.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 10 December 1997: Standard registration
- LCPSPA (Working name)
- LITTLE CHALFONT COUNTY COMBINED SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Monica Gill | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Solomon Kamal-Uddin | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ivan Mera | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Himanshi Mody | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jasneet Lad | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Whitney Hall | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Colleen Byrne | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Morey | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Hacking | Trustee | 10 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.25k | £26.94k | £22.64k | £34.20k | £31.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.82k | £23.13k | £14.64k | £11.28k | £36.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 September 2024 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 September 2024 | 80 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 January 2024 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 11 January 2024 | 195 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 January 2022 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 January 2022 | 203 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 21 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 21 October 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26TH SEPTEMBER 1997 as amended on 10 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Little Chalfont Cp School
Oakington Avenue
Amersham
HP6 6SX
- Phone:
- 01494762467
- Email:
- jasneetsehmi@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window