LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF CILWENDEG RESIDENTIAL HOME
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 26 January 1998: Standard registration
- 09 August 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2007 | 29/02/2008 | 28/02/2009 | 28/02/2010 | 28/02/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £905 | £900 | £1.40k | £1.30k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.16k | £1.61k | £1.34k | £1.59k | £111 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2011 | 21 February 2012 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2010 | 29 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JUNE 1996.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE RESIDENTS AND FORMER RESIDENTS OF THE HOME WHO AS SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM, OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOME FOR THE PURPOSE OF CARRYING OUT OF THE ABOVE OBJECT.
Area of benefit
CILWENDEG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window