Accounts and annual returns AZARIAH

Charity number: 1067891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 April 2022 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 March 2021 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 02 March 2021 396 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required