THE WESTMORLAND COUNTY AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 1067224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £635.67k £656.57k £706.80k £712.05k £249.45k
Total expenditure £657.97k £721.20k £725.91k £800.54k £350.81k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £47.95k
Income - Donations and legacies £19.49k £20.03k £24.86k £50.15k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £105.82k £87.65k £98.06k £95.05k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £450.22k £481.79k £519.70k £503.34k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £60.14k £67.10k £64.18k £63.51k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £592.08k £657.73k £658.99k £732.84k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £65.89k £63.47k £66.92k £67.70k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £5.30k £8.06k £6.26k £7.18k N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A