Governing document ST. MARGARET'S HALL USERS GROUP
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 AUGUST 1998, AMENDED 30 MAY 2000, 24 MAY 2002, 29 OCTOBER 2002 AND 25 AUGUST 2010 AS AMENDED ON 07 SEP 2017 as amended on 29 Jun 2018 as amended on 05 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
TO MANAGE AND MAINTAIN THE PROPERTY KNOWN AS ST MARGARET'S HALL CONISTON ROAD, IN THE DISTRICT OF HATHERLEY, IN THE COUNTY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE HALL") AND SUCH OTHER PROPERTY AS THE CHARITY MAY REQUIRE, FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF HATHERLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.