Accounts and annual returns BOURNEMOUTH, STROUDEN PARK CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1066880
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 May 2020 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required