MUDIAD YSGOLION MEITHRIN - COUNTY POWYS

Charity number: 1067144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 08 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 August 2019 189 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 July 2018 159 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required