1ST HIRST SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1067060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £17.44k £15.67k £12.38k £12.37k £47.69k
Total expenditure £14.72k £15.02k £11.87k £13.44k £9.77k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £23.60k