1ST HIRST SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1067060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Graham Dryburgh Trustee 21 September 2019 None on record
Rozalind McAuley Trustee 21 September 2019 None on record
Alison Anderson Trustee 15 September 2018 None on record
Emma Watson Trustee 21 September 2019 None on record
SUSAN BLACK Trustee 21 September 2019
WANSBECK DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL Received: On time
Nicola Small Trustee 20 October 2020 None on record
Iain Anderson Trustee 15 September 2018 None on record
DAVID MOLE Chair 04 September 2011 None on record
Claire Louise Brown Trustee 21 September 2019 None on record
BARRIE WILSON Trustee None on record
Clare Dodd Trustee 15 September 2018 None on record
Christopher William Leslie Young Trustee 24 September 2016 None on record