SOUNDINGS AUDIO LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of free, impartial and relevant information about living with sight loss to blind and partially-sighted people within the United Kingdom. This is predominantly offered in the accessible format of audio.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 January 1998: Standard registration
- 16 April 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SOUNDINGS (Working name)
- INFOSOUNDINGS LIMITED (Previous name)
- VISOUND LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.41k | £579 | £8.24k | £395 | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.62k | £4.82k | £4.46k | £7.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 03 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 14 August 2007 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 20 February 2006 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 20 February 2006 | 20 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 19 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 21 NOVEMBER 1997 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATES OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 OCTOBER 2005 AND 3 FEBRUARY 2006
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE BLIND OR THE PARTIALLY SIGHTED OR THOSE LABOURING UNDER SOME TEMPORARY OR PERMANENT INCAPACITY OR DISABILITY WHICH MAKES READING A STRAIN, BY THE PROVISION OF RECORDED TAPES, LARGE PRINT OR TACTILE READING MATTER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window