ALTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1066931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £7.12k £10.48k £6.16k £10.11k £6.26k
Total expenditure £5.81k £10.03k £13.20k £10.89k £6.98k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A