Accounts and annual returns INSTITUTE FOR EAST WEST STRATEGIC STUDIES

Charity number: 1068421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2022 21 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2021 28 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2020 22 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2019 08 December 2019 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2018 25 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2018 Not Required