Financial history INSTITUTE FOR EAST WEST STRATEGIC STUDIES

Charity number: 1068421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2018 01/01/2019 01/01/2020 01/01/2021 01/01/2022
Total gross income £4.00k £5.00k £5.00k £1.00k £3.00k
Total expenditure £4.00k £5.00k £5.00k £1.00k £3.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A