BEAUFORT COTTAGE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1079834
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
FREDERIC BARRELET Trustee 01 April 2014 None on record
JONATHAN GRIMWADE Chair None on record
John Day Trustee 30 November 2020 None on record
PROF CELIA MARR Trustee 01 May 2016 None on record
Camilla Scott Trustee 03 April 2020 None on record
STUART WILLIAMS Trustee 01 March 2017 None on record