HOLLINS INSTITUTE EDUCATIONAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity promotes education and training in the Hollins area of Bury, and makes grants to individuals and organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bury
Governance
- 26 July 2001: Standard registration
- HOLLINS YOUNG MENS INSTITUTE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Taylor | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF BURY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.00k | £996 | £1.15k | £1.15k | £13.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £804 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 17 MAY 2001 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16 OCTOBER 2006 AND 21 AUGUST 2007.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION IN HOLLINS AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
HOLLINS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
MANAGEMENT ACCOUNTANCY
TOWN HALL
KNOWSLEY STREET
BURY
BL9 0SW
- Phone:
- 01612535042
- Email:
- s.f.blake@bury.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window