LONDON, SPANISH HOMERTON CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1067303
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Arranging meetings for public worship, which includes Bible education and training in Christian living. Preaching the Christian message to the public within the congregation area. Distributing Bibles and other religious literature. All of these services and facilities are provided without charge.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020

Total income: £1,995
Total expenditure: £1,894

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of London
  • Islington
  • Newham
  • Redbridge
  • Tower Hamlets
  • Waltham Forest

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 January 1998: Standard registration
  • 04 March 2022: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 04 March 2022: Funds transferred to 275946 THE KINGDOM HALL TRUST
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.27k £3.76k £2.83k £2.36k £2.00k
Total expenditure £7.96k £3.33k £3.26k £2.73k £1.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 August 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required