LONDON, RUSSIAN WEST CONGREGATION OF JEHOVAH'S WITNESSES

Charity number: 1067360
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.31k £7.86k £4.63k £3.43k £8.71k
Total expenditure £8.69k £8.11k £3.39k £2.57k £5.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A