WIRELESS PRESERVATION SOCIETY (NATIONAL WIRELESS MUSEUM)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in wireless communication
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 June 1998: Standard registration
- 27 April 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2004 | 30/06/2005 | 30/06/2006 | 30/06/2007 | 31/10/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.84k | £276.98k | £15.50k | £6.35k | £7.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.99k | £67.06k | £63.52k | £51.18k | £135.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | 22 April 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | 03 July 2008 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | 03 July 2008 | 64 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | 28 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | 20 March 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2005 | 30 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2005 | 30 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2004 | 22 November 2005 | 206 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2004 | 22 November 2005 | 206 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 MAY 1998.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY THEREOF TO : A) TO ACQUIRE, RECORD, PRESERVE AND DISPLAY ITEMS RELATING TO ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. B) TO ESTABLISH, EQUIP AND MAINTAIN A PUBLIC MUSEUM TO HOUSE ITEMS RELATING TO ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATION AND ELECTRONIC RELATED ITEMS. C) TO PROMOTE AND DEVELOP INTEREST, RESEARCH AND KNOWLEDGE IN ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATION AND ELECTRONICS AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window