ROTHWELL VICTORIA INFANT SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Various Fund Raising Events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 11 February 1998: Standard registration
- ROTHWELL VICTORIA COUNTY INFANT SCHOOL PARENTS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hayley Dobrin | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Antony Stanley-Smith | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.93k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.85k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 10 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 February 2025 | 225 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 February 2025 | 591 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 February 2025 | 956 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1409 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1409 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH DECEMBER 1997
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
ROTHWELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rothwell Infant School
School Lane
Rothwell
Kettering
NN14 6HZ
- Phone:
- 01536906699
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window