THE QUILTERS' GUILD OF THE BRITISH ISLES

Charity number: 1067361
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £790.36k £747.51k £750.26k £928.72k £649.85k
Total expenditure £787.37k £752.17k £757.87k £846.02k £565.47k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £51.04k £56.36k £54.44k £82.57k £37.19k
Income - Other trading activities £349.81k £45.25k £390.11k £81.07k £40.31k
Income - Charitable activities £343.40k £637.44k £295.76k £422.64k £557.75k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.09k £1.60k £1.97k £3.45k £2.12k
Income - Other £44.03k £6.85k £7.99k £338.98k £12.47k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £750.00k £709.37k £705.84k £798.19k £531.03k
Expenditure - Raising funds £37.37k £42.80k £52.03k £47.82k £34.44k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £19.87k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0