THE QUILTERS' GUILD OF THE BRITISH ISLES

Charity number: 1067361
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HELEN VIVIAN Trustee 01 May 2017 None on record
Melanie Jane Williams Trustee 09 June 2020 None on record
Jane Charmian Blackburn Trustee 12 November 2019 None on record
HELEN MARGARET PRINGLE Trustee 11 May 2019 None on record
Sheila Evans Trustee 17 January 2018
THE ORME ALMSHOUSES Received: On time
Sheena Lesley Roberts Trustee 01 May 2021 None on record
Claire Powell Trustee 18 September 2019 None on record
Dr Shona Jessie Maureen Kelly Trustee 01 May 2021 None on record
JENNIFER ENID HALL Trustee 11 May 2019 None on record
ELIZABETH INGLE Trustee 01 May 2017 None on record
Marion Claire Yeodal Trustee 01 May 2021 None on record