FRIENDS OF ELSTOW LOWER SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
School PTA - Fundraising for enrichment of children's school life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 27 January 1998: Standard registration
- FRIENDS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna-May Murphy | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Osita Egbubine | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Denise Vaselka | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Mary Murphy | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Margaret Jean Turner | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Ann Canham | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Louise Smith | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.48k | £1.54k | £269 | £2.43k | £7.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.65k | £2.11k | £348 | £1.30k | £2.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 16 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2022 | 350 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON THE 30 SEPTEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
BEDFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Elstow School
Abbey Fields
Elstow
BEDFORD
MK42 9GP
- Phone:
- 01234302300
- Website:
-
elstowschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window