Accounts and annual returns BETHEL TEMPLE OF CHRIST

Charity number: 1076102
Charity reporting is overdue by 145 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 145 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 145 days
Annual return 01 April 2022 08 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 08 December 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2021 29 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 29 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2020 21 April 2021 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 21 April 2021 79 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2019 29 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window