ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY BERKS/ HANTS/ SURREY BORDER BRANCH

Charity number: 1067776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 20 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required