Financial history ROYAL SCOTTISH COUNTRY DANCE SOCIETY BERKS/ HANTS/ SURREY BORDER BRANCH

Charity number: 1067776
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £10.76k £11.20k £10.49k £12.44k £2.15k
Total expenditure £10.48k £9.77k £10.37k £13.90k £1.68k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A