THE FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN BRUTON SOMERSET

Charity number: 1085782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 01 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 01 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required