Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN BRUTON SOMERSET

Charity number: 1085782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £2.05k £2.32k £1.44k £1.36k £753
Total expenditure £72 £0 £380 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A