Accounts and annual returns SUDBURY UPPER SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (SUSA)

Charity number: 1068167
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 24 May 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 26 April 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 27 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 27 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 11 September 2020 103 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required