Financial history SUDBURY UPPER SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (SUSA)

Charity number: 1068167
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £48.61k £71.53k £15.67k £1.94k £5.17k
Total expenditure £82.18k £186.65k £53.98k £13.79k £7.55k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A