ACTION FOR BRAZIL'S CHILDREN TRUST

Charity number: 1069022
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016
Total gross income £508.65k £401.48k £844.69k £673.33k £270.47k
Total expenditure £464.06k £559.50k £639.02k £850.16k £303.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Donations and legacies £381.60k N/A £110.31k £128.15k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £53.55k N/A £51.76k £57.37k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £72.97k N/A £679.66k £487.38k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £77 N/A £23 £23 N/A
Income - Other £457 N/A £2.95k £419 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £4.00k £11.50k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £368.28k N/A £476.90k £732.33k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £15.67k N/A £33.44k £37.89k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £608.23k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A