Governing document WE ARE IVE LTD

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 APRIL 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 DECEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/09/2014 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY PROMOTING AND DEVELOPING CREATIVE LEARNING IN SCHOOLS OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4 OF THE MEMORANDUM
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.