Trustees WE ARE IVE LTD

Charity number: 1074583
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rashik Parmar Chair 22 May 2017
None on record
Nick Street Trustee 02 September 2022
None on record
NA Lindsey Johnson Trustee 10 March 2021
None on record
Philippa Hale Trustee 14 June 2018
None on record
JONATHAN STRAIGHT Trustee 19 September 2017
None on record