ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION (DARTMOUTH BRANCH)

Charity number: 1067971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 March 2021 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 March 2020 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 30 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required