ROYAL NAVAL ASSOCIATION (DARTMOUTH BRANCH)

Charity number: 1067971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.39k £666 £333 £443 £115
Total expenditure £1.36k £578 £506 £597 £209
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A