NEWBURY CHURCHES EMERGENCY RELIEF FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Emergency grants to individuals in need, only within the Newbury area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 05 November 1998: Standard registration
- NCERF (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN ELLIOTT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Vaughan | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Joy Mawdesley | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £551 | £300 | £300 | £1.30k | £303 | |
|
Total expenditure | £839 | £648 | £276 | £255 | £390 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 February 2025 | 236 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 February 2025 | 602 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2024 | 731 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 March 2022 | 264 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21ST SEPTEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF HARDSHIP OF THOSE CLIENTS FACING AN EMERGENCY WHEN RECOMMENDED BY A DESIGNATED VOLUNTARY AGENCY
Area of benefit
WEST BERKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
STABLE COTTAGE
OAK ASH
CHADDLEWORTH
NEWBURY
RG20 7DU
- Phone:
- 01488646587
- Email:
- pandjkelley@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window