PRINCES RISBOROUGH & DISTRICT CENTRE FOR SCOUTING & GUIDING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of facilities for Scouting and Guiding in Princes Risborough
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 03 February 1998: Standard registration
- PRINCES RISBOROUGH SCOUTS & GUIDES SITE TRUSTEES (Working name)
- PRINCES RISBOROUGH SCOUTS AND GUIDES SITE TRUSTEES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Nina Sweet | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Wales | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Forest | Trustee | 29 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jayne Norie | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Christine Ann Brown | Trustee | 15 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dian Elizabeth Hope | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
GINA HELEN NORTH | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Sculfor | Trustee | 23 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALAN WILLIAM BURNISTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
DAVID WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.54k | £16.52k | £19.80k | £22.82k | £23.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.85k | £11.06k | £15.30k | £25.99k | £28.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £10.67k | £5.30k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 2ND DECEMBER 1927
Charitable objects
TO MANAGE AND MAINTAIN THE LONGWICK ROAD SITE AND CENTRE FOR MEMBERS OF THE ASSOCIATIONS OF THE BOY SCOUTS AND GIRL GUIDES OF THE PRINCES RISBOROUGH AND DISTRICT BRANCHES.
Area of benefit
PRINCES RISBOROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Chalkshire Road
Butlers Cross
AYLESBURY
Buckinghamshire
HP17 0TS
- Phone:
- 01296624267
- Email:
- sgchair@prscouts.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window