Accounts and annual returns BRISTOL ISLAMIC SCHOOLS TRUST
Charity number: 1070273

Charity reporting is overdue by 34 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 34 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 34 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 24 July 2022 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 26 July 2022 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 202 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 202 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 09 November 2019 | 193 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | 12 November 2019 | 196 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window