Accounts and annual returns ST. PETER'S PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1067994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 April 2021 282 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 947 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 18 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 21 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required