Financial history ST. PETER'S PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1067994
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £18.94k £12.92k £26.63k £22.53k £22.34k
Total expenditure £18.08k £10.26k £19.01k £25.10k £34.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A