CAREW MEMORIAL HALL COMMITTEE

Charity number: 1069242
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2021 03 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2020 14 March 2021 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2019 14 March 2021 407 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2018 06 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2017 28 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Not Required