REAL OUTREACH IN VEHICLE EVANGELISM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
providing a christian based mobile youth drop in at a number of areas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Gloucestershire
- Herefordshire
- Monmouthshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- ROVE (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 May 2021 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 13 May 2021 | 378 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JANUARY 1998 AS AMENDED 7 AUGUST 1998
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AMONGST YOUNG PERSONS IN THE FOREST OF DEAN AND ITS IMMEDIATE SURROUNDING AREAS, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
IN THE FOREST OF DEAN AND ITS IMMEDIATE SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window