SUTTON-IN-CRAVEN VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operation of a village hall as a facility for local people and organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 17 April 2000: Standard registration
- SAINT THOMAS' HALL SUTTON IN CRAVEN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ROBERT CHRISTOPHER HARRISON-YOUNG | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev Suzanne McCarter | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Anthony John Mitchell | Trustee | 29 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN ELIZABETH GREEN | Trustee | 27 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Russell Gill | Trustee | 28 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alison Gill | Trustee | 28 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Norris | Trustee | 25 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRYAN BLACKIE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.97k | £32.28k | £24.06k | £24.61k | £17.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.11k | £33.16k | £15.76k | £29.03k | £14.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.33k | £18.28k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND DEED OF TRUST DATED 1 MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY HEREBY DEMISED (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE TRUST PROPERTY) SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF SUTTON-IN-CRAVEN IN THE COUNTY OF NORTH YORKSHIRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETING, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SUTTON-IN-CRAVEN IN THE COUNTY OF NORTH YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sutton Village Hall
Park Drive
Sutton-in-Craven
Keighley
BD20 7JQ
- Phone:
- 01535 636639
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window