Accounts and annual returns BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE VERBIER FESTIVAL AND ACADEMY
Charity number: 1069618
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | 16 November 2016 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | 16 November 2016 | On time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 15 April 2016 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | 13 November 2014 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | 13 November 2014 | On time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 10 February 2014 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 10 February 2014 | 10 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window