Accounts and annual returns MANCHESTER AIRPORT COMMUNITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1071703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 February 2020 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 04 February 2020 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 December 2019 322 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 February 2019 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 29 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window