THE DHARMAJ SOCIETY OF LONDON

Charity number: 1070401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 August 2020 25 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2020 25 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 15 August 2019 04 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2019 04 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 15 August 2018 04 July 2019 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2018 04 July 2019 19 days late Download
Annual return 15 August 2017 01 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2017 01 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 15 August 2016 07 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 August 2016 07 April 2017 On time Download