ACTION FOR KIDS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1068841
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £2.31m £2.24m £2.14m £2.02m £1.54m
Total expenditure £2.49m £2.23m £2.13m £2.22m £2.50m
Income from government contracts £52.52k £51.67k £27.46k £65.81k £68.27k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.02m £1.99m £1.81m £1.63m £1.19m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £283.70k £244.91k £298.54k £314.24k £263.61k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £410 £3.72k £34.21k £74.48k £83.37k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £173.16k £40.56k £247.52k £140.04k £45.06k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.04m £1.86m £1.76m £1.87m £2.19m
Expenditure - Raising funds £442.85k £369.42k £368.26k £345.93k £311.26k
Expenditure - Governance £73.20k £76.40k £77.25k £53.87k £73.55k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0