THE BRITISH SOCIETY FOR ALLERGY & CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The BSACI aims and objectives are to support its membership in providing a high quality, NHS based service for the treatment of people with allergic disease and related disorders of the immune system. It does so by carrying out a wide range of activities through the governance of the BSACI Council which are implemented by the Executive Officers, Sub Groups and Administration Office.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 April 1998: Standard registration
- BSACI (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Claudia Gore | Trustee | 05 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jurgen Schwarze | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Common | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Gillian Vance | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr ROBIN GORE | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Louise Jane Michaelis | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fawzia Runa Ali | Trustee | 07 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Graham Roberts | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £703.56k | £655.20k | £438.51k | £1.23m | £396.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £631.04k | £661.06k | £480.73k | £1.10m | £551.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £15.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £5.00k | £30 | N/A | £3.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £637.15k | £601.33k | N/A | £1.15m | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £27.95k | £25.71k | N/A | £27.55k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £33.46k | £28.14k | N/A | £49.26k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £624.42k | £654.20k | N/A | £1.09m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £6.62k | £6.86k | N/A | £7.97k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £250.66k | £59.38k | N/A | £84.13k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £6.62k | £6.86k | N/A | £7.97k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 09 June 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 FEB 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 OCT 2022 as amended on 03 Oct 2022 as amended on 07 Oct 2023 as amended on 05 Oct 2024 as amended on 05 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND ENCOURAGE THE STUDY OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; TO WORK TOWARDS THE RECOGNITION OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY AS SPECIALISED BRANCHES OF MEDICINE AND TO ENCOURAGE THE PUBLICATION OF ORIGINAL CONTRIBUTIONS TO THE STUDY OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BSACI
STUDIO 16
CLOISTERS HOUSE
8 BATTERSEA PARK ROAD
LONDON
SW8 4BG
- Phone:
- 0207 501 3910
- Email:
- info@bsaci.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window